Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Cybersecurity - Workgroup to Study Data Security - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings, Hershey, Hester, Simonaire, and Watson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Data Security to study certain data protection standards, identify existing standards that would best be assimilated by State agencies, and develop recommendations on and assess certain fiscal impacts; and requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report by December 1, 2024 and a final report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by June 30, 2025.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Cybersecurity - Workgroup to Study Data Security - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Cybersecurity - Workgroup to Study Data Security - Establishment
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/27/2024 10:38 AM
Click to return on the top page