Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the construction of new multifamily residential buildings with separate garages, carports, or driveways for each residential unit to include certain parking spaces for electric vehicle charging; requiring certain significant renovations of housing units with separate garages, carports, or driveways for each residential unit to include certain parking spaces for electric vehicle recharging; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0889
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Building Code - Construction and Significant Renovation of Housing Units - Electric Vehicle Parking Spaces
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:56 PM
Click to return on the top page