Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition on counting a certain minority business enterprise as both a woman-owned business and a business owned by a member of an ethnic or racial group for purposes of the State Minority Business Enterprise Program; and requiring the Board of Public Works to adopt certain regulations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/17/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-1)
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/17/2021 2/17/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Procurement - Minority Business Enterprise Program - Participation by Gender or Race
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Health and Government Operations 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2021 3/26/2021 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-1) 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:15 PM
Click to return on the top page