Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Sponsored by
Senator Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the Maryland Wine and Grape Promotion Fund and the Advisory Commission on Maryland Wine and Grape Growing; establishing the Advisory Commission on Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing in the Department of Commerce as the successor to the Advisory Commission on Maryland Wine and Grape Growing; establishing the Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing Promotion Fund to provide grants that promote the advantages and attributes of State breweries, distilleries, and wineries and their products; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0854
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2022
Legislative Date
2/04/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {563225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters Ways and Means
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {683429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2022 2/04/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {563225/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Economic Matters Ways and Means 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable with Amendments {683429/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 462
Text - Chapter - Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Alcohol Manufacturing and Promotion
(   5-1901 through 5-1912 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:03 PM
Click to return on the top page