Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program – Amount of Annual Subsidies
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount of funds in each of calendar years 2024 and 2025, the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange is authorized to designate for annual subsidies under the State-Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program to include unspent funds designated for subsidies for young adults in a previous calendar year.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0953
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2024
Legislative Date
1/30/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-36)
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2024 1/30/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program – Amount of Annual Subsidies
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Favorable Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2024 2/17/2024 Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program – Amount of Annual Subsidies
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2024 2/26/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Adopted 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2024 3/13/2024 Second Reading Passed 52CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2024 3/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (103-36) 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/15/2024 3:28 PM
Click to return on the top page