Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsored by
Senators Beidle, Feldman, and Hershey
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing certain standards and requirements governing the provision of services and the granting of privileges by the Maryland Aviation Administration with respect to commercial activity undertaken by rental vehicle companies and peer-to-peer car sharing programs at State airports; establishing the Administration's authority over commercial activity at Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport extends to a commercial zone that is within a 7-mile radius of the main terminal; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1304
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/03/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {617677/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2021 2/03/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {617677/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
(   19-520 )
(   18.5-106, 18-108, 5-408 )
Last Updated: 4/5/2021 5:06 PM
Click to return on the top page