Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State and Private Construction Contracts and State Procurement Contracts – Prompt Payment and Interest Requirements
Sponsored by
Senators Kramer, Gile, Jackson, Rosapepe, Salling, and West
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring a private construction contract to include a provision requiring the owner to pay the contractor within 45 days after the receipt of a proper invoice following completion of the work or, if the owner withholds all or part of an amount invoiced, to send a certain notification to the contractor; requiring a contract between a contractor and a subcontractor on a private or State construction contract to include a provision requiring the contractor to pay the subcontractor within 7 days after receipt of payment; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1365
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State and Private Construction Contracts and State Procurement Contracts – Prompt Payment and Interest Requirements
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:56 PM
Click to return on the top page