Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Food System Resiliency Council; providing that the goals of the Council are to address the food insecurity crisis in the State due to the pandemic, develop recommendations to increase the long-term resiliency of the food system, and develop by November 1, 2021, a plan to increase the production and procurement of Maryland certified food; requiring the Council to submit an interim report by November 1, 2021, and recommendations on a statewide food policy council to the General Assembly by November 1, 2022; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {844331/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/14/2021
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2021
Legislative Date
4/06/2021
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-36)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Senate 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {844331/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2021 3/14/2021 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2021 4/06/2021 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (102-36) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 725
Text - Chapter - Maryland Food System Resiliency Council
(   14-1101 through 14-1103 )
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page