Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, Feldman, Guzzone, Peters, Robinson, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling a battery operated smoke alarm in the State for a certain purpose on or after October 1, 2018, unless the smoke alarm is a sealed, tamper resistant unit incorporating a silence/hush button and using one or more long-life batteries; exempting certain alarms and detectors from a certain prohibition; defining "long-life battery"; and imposing a fine of up to $1,000 for a violation of the Act.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0810
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {688479/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {290118/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (121-11)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {688479/1 Adopted 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/27/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {290118/1 Adopted 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (121-11) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 484
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Battery Operated Smoke Alarms
(   9-101, 9-104, 9-106, 9-106.1, 9-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page