Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Facilities – Procedures for Changes and Closures – Definition and Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Carter
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that requirements for purchasing, leasing, changing the use of, or closing State facilities apply to facilities owned, leased, or operated for the purpose of providing benefits to clients; and requiring the Department of Human Services, on or before August 1, 2024, to submit a report on any State facility owned, leased, or operated by the Department for the purpose of providing benefits to clients that was closed on or after January 1, 2023 to certain committees of the General Assembly.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - State Facilities – Procedures for Changes and Closures – Definition and Reporting
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/29/2024 2/29/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:57 PM
Click to return on the top page