Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2022
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Ready, Salling, Hough, Carozza, Corderman, Gallion, and Bailey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of a certain grant to certain counties under certain circumstances; decreasing, from 2.25% to 1%, the minimum tax rate that a county is required to impose on an individual's Maryland taxable income; and applying the Act to all taxable years Beginning after December 31, 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Real Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2022
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Real Local Tax Relief for Working Families Act of 2022
Senate 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page