Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Blighted Property - Special Property Tax Rate
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Charles County to set a special property tax rate that is 12.5% greater than the tax rate that is generally applicable to real property for a class of real property that is defined as blighted by local law; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2022.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1114
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Blighted Property - Special Property Tax Rate
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Charles County - Blighted Property - Special Property Tax Rate
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/3/2022 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page