Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audits – Risk–Limiting Audits
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local boards of elections, to conduct a risk-limiting audit after each statewide election; authorizing, rather than requiring, the State Board, in collaboration with the local boards, to conduct an automated software audit after a statewide election; and requiring the State Board, in collaboration with certain local boards, to conduct pilot risk-limiting audits after the November 2022 statewide general election.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0745
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0759 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022, January 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Postelection Tabulation Audits – Risk–Limiting Audits
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page