Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Affordable Assisted Living Enhanced Care Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Affordable Assisted Living Enhanced Care Pilot Program in the Maryland Department of Health to establish affordable assisted living enhanced care residences for the provision of enhanced care to eligible adults who are at least 60 years old; prohibiting a residence selected for the Pilot Program from being prohibited from admitting into the residence certain individuals who are not eligible for the Pilot Program; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations from the Program by November 1, 2024.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Affordable Assisted Living Enhanced Care Pilot Program
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:04 PM
Click to return on the top page