Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsored by
The President and Senators Smith, Folden, James, and West
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering the jurisdiction of the juvenile court over a child of a certain age alleged to have committed a certain offense; altering certain procedures relating to juvenile intake, detention, and probation; requiring the Secretary of Juvenile Services to include certain programs in a certain plan; requiring the State Board of Victim Services to include certain information about filing a certain complaint in a certain pamphlet; repealing certain provisions relating to the State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0814
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024, October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {203524/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {993224/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {973922/1 (Senator Charles) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {313024/1 (Senator Salling) Withdrawn
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {503627/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {633827/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (17-29)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Reform
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Reform
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2024 2/28/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments {203524/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Floor Amendment {993224/1 (Senator Lam) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Floor Amendment {973922/1 (Senator Charles) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Floor Amendment {313024/1 (Senator Salling) Withdrawn 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Floor Amendment {503627/1 (Senator Carter) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Floor Amendment {633827/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (17-29) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/29/2024 2/19/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Reform
Senate 3/04/2024 2/21/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2024 2/27/2024 Referred Judiciary 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:57 PM
Click to return on the top page