Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick County - Property Tax - Semiannual Payment Schedule and Imposition of Interest
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the circumstances under which interest may be imposed by Frederick County on certain property taxes not paid on or before October 1 of the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 20, 2022.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Frederick County - Property Tax - Semiannual Payment Schedule and Imposition of Interest
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2022 3/01/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2022 3/04/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/3/2022 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page