Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Use of Force Incident Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a reporting requirement applicable to a law enforcement officer or police officer involved in a use of force incident in the line of duty; and requiring, by July 1, 2024 and annually thereafter, a local law enforcement agency to publish on its public website the aggregate data reported of police officers' use of force; requiring a local law enforcement agency, by January 1, 2023 and every 3 months thereafter, to publish on its public website the total number of use of force incidents reported; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1044
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022, July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Use of Force Incident Reports
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety – Use of Force Incident Reports
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page