Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing requirements, procedures, and prohibitions relating to the use of facial recognition technology by a law enforcement agency under certain circumstances; requiring, beginning October 1, 2023, and each October 1 thereafter, a law enforcement agency that uses or contracts for the use of facial recognition technology to complete an audit to determine compliance with the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1046
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Facial Recognition Technology - Requirements, Procedures, and Prohibitions
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-501 through 2-510 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page