Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Sponsored by
Senator Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Making victims of certain crimes involving the operation of a vessel or motor vehicle eligible for payment of a claim through the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1451
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (138-1)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 7:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Vallario) Adopted (138-1) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 459
Text - Chapter - Criminal Injuries Compensation – Acts Involving Operation of Vessel or Motor Vehicle
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page