Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the Department of State Police, the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission, and the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to provide certain information related to public safety and criminal justice in a certain manner to the Department of Legislative Services on or before a certain date each year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Reassigned to Judicial Proceedings 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:05 PM
Click to return on the top page