Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Hester
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board; requiring a person to be licensed as a stream restoration contractor or be employed by an individual or entity that is licensed as a stream restoration contractor before the person performs or solicits to perform stream restoration contractor services in the State, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department of the Environment, in consultation with the Chesapeake Bay Trust, to develop a certain assessment; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/01/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2024 2/01/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Stream Restoration Contractors Licensing Board, Stream Restoration Contractors, and Stream Restoration Project Requirements
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   1-406,   18-101 through 18-601 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:59 PM
Click to return on the top page