Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Sponsored by
Senator Mautz
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting applicants for employment as a paramedic or an emergency medical technician with the Emergency Medical Services Division or as a 9-1-1 Center dispatcher at the Dorchester County 9-1-1 Center within the Dorchester County Department of Emergency Services from the prohibition on employers requiring or demanding that an individual submit to or take a polygraph examination as a condition of prospective employment.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0589
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153420/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {153420/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Dorchester County - County Applicants - Polygraph Examination
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Judiciary 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/17/2024 Returned Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/8/2024 9:46 AM
Click to return on the top page