Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Hershey, Jennings, Jackson, Rosapepe, Lee, and Watson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Establishing the Office of Security Management within the Department of Information Technology; establishing the Maryland Cybersecurity Coordinating Council; requiring certain IT units to certify compliance with certain cybersecurity standards; requiring each unit of the Executive Branch of State government and certain local entities to report certain cybersecurity incidents in a certain manner; requiring the Department of General Services to establish certain basic security requirements in be included in certain contracts; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1346
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government – Cybersecurity – Coordination and Governance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693322/1
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {693322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {883120/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {883725/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {833527/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {543628/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-16)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
74 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Government – Cybersecurity – Coordination and Governance
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693322/1 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable with Amendments {693322/1 Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {883120/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {883725/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Floor Amendment {833527/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {543628/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/05/2022 Third Reading Passed (113-16) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 74 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2022 4/03/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Text - Chapter - State Government - Cybersecurity - Coordination and Governance
(   13-115, 3.5-101, 3.5-2A-01 through 3.5-2A-06, 3.5-301, 3.5-302, 3.5-303, 3.5-307, 3.5-309, 3.5-311, 3.5-404, 3.5-405, 3.5-406, 3A-101 through 3A-702,   4-316.1 )
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:33 AM
Click to return on the top page