Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions and Reimbursement Payments
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier (Chair, Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Labor to offer to employing units for certain calendar years a variety of payment plan options that spread certain contribution due dates through the end of August; requiring the Secretary to offer a variety of additional payment plan options; authorizing certain employing units to elect to delay submitting certain contributions for certain calendar quarters; altering the nonprofit and governmental entities that may elect to defer payment of reimbursement bills for calendar year 2021; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0908
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Payment Plans
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {147175/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {573793/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Carey) Adopted (126-1)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-0)
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Payment Plans
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {147175/1 Adopted 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Economic Matters 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/29/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Favorable with Amendments {573793/1 Adopted 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Carey) Adopted (126-1) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2021 3/13/2021 Third Reading Passed (125-0) 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Senate Concurs House Amendments 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/10/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions and Reimbursement Payments
Post Passage 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 48
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions and Reimbursement Payments
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:13 PM
Click to return on the top page