Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person applying for a certain permit from the Department of the Environment to include in the application the EJ Score from the Maryland EJ tool for the census tract where the applicant is seeking the permit; requiring the Department, on receiving a certain permit application, to review an environmental justice analysis of the census tract where the applicant is seeking a permit using the Maryland EJ tool; and requiring notices regarding certain permit applications to include information related to EJ Scores and certain analyses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1200
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {823926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {823926/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment – Permit Applications – Environmental Justice Screening
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page