Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Investigations - Timeliness
Sponsored by
Senator Lam (By Request - Joint Audit and Evaluation Committee)
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Human Services to implement policies requiring a local department of social services or the appropriate law enforcement agency that fails to conduct a child abuse or neglect investigation or complete a certain report within certain statutory time frames to report the delay and the reason for the delay in a certain manner; and requiring the Department to assess certain studies and methodologies, develop a certain assessment, and complete the assessment by certain dates.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1248
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Investigations - Timeliness
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873027/1
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hettleman) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Hettleman) Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Motion Withdraw Committee Amendment {873027/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Substitute Committee Amendment {243621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Investigations - Timeliness
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Child Abuse and Neglect - Investigations - Timeliness
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873027/1 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hettleman) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {873027/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {243621/1 Withdrawn 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Hettleman) Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Motion Withdraw Committee Amendment {873027/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Substitute Committee Amendment {243621/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Child Abuse and Neglect - Investigations - Timeliness
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Judiciary 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:47 AM
Click to return on the top page