Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Contracts
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring pharmacy benefits managers or group purchasing organizations, rather than pharmacy services administrative organizations, to submit contracts between pharmacy services administrative organizations and pharmacy benefits managers or group purchasing organizations to the Maryland Insurance Administration; allowing pharmacy services administrative organizations to provide copies of certain documents to independent pharmacies in an electronic or paper format; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0973
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/08/2022
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413820/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2022
Legislative Date
5/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/08/2022 2/08/2022 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Contracts
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {413820/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Contracts
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Health and Government Operations 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/12/2022 5/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Text - Chapter - Pharmacy Services Administrative Organizations and Pharmacy Benefits Managers – Contracts
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page