Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Nursing Homes
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health, on request of a county, to delegate to the county the authority to conduct site visits and full surveys of nursing homes; and requiring that the Maryland Department of Health and certain counties equally share the costs of conducting site visits and full surveys delegated by the Secretary under the Act.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1475
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Nursing Homes
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Facilities – Delegation of Inspection Authority – Related Institutions and Nursing Homes
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable with Amendments {623720/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Facilities - Delegation of Inspection Authority - Nursing Homes
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/16/2024 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page