Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Withdrawal Policy - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees (Cameron Carden Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public institution of higher education to adopt a policy to authorize a student to withdraw under extenuating circumstances and reimburse the student for tuition and fees paid for the semester in which the student withdraws under certain circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Student Withdrawal Policy - Reimbursement of Tuition and Fees (Cameron Carden Act of 2024)
Senate 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   15-138 )
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 11:58 AM
Click to return on the top page