Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Sponsored by
Senators Hershey, Feldman, and Guzzone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing certain community solar energy generating systems as a subclass of personal property; providing that the county tax rate applicable to certain community solar energy generating systems may be a different rate from the county tax rate applicable to other personal property, subject to a certain limitation; authorizing a county or municipal government body to exempt, by law, personal property that is a certain community solar energy generating system from a county or municipal corporation property tax under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0954
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679238/1
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {679238/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Property Tax – Solar Energy Systems
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/19/2021 2/19/2021 Hearing 2/24 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {679238/1 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {679238/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Ways and Means 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
(   6-302, 7-402, 8-101, 8-105 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:26 PM
Click to return on the top page