Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Benson and Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain summary that certain employers are required to keep conspicuously posted in certain places of employment include certain antiretaliation provisions; prohibiting certain employers from taking certain actions under the Maryland Wage and Hour Law and the Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law; prohibiting certain employers from discriminating against certain employees under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0641 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/16/2021 2/16/2021 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-103, 3-403, 3-423, 3-428, 3-501.1, 3-504, 3-507.2, 3-508 )
Last Updated: 7/26/2021 6:56 AM
Click to return on the top page