Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Virtual Education Days Pilot Program in Garrett County and Allegany County; authorizing the Garrett County Superintendent and the Allegany County Superintendent to order a virtual education day instead of closing a public school in the event of inclement weather; requiring a principal to notify students, parents, and school staff of a decision to have a virtual education day; requiring that accommodations be made for students and staff who do not have easy access to the Internet; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1129
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Garrett County and Allegany County – Public Schools – Virtual Education Days Pilot Program
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/02/2022 3/02/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:03 p.m.
(   7-103.2 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:07 PM
Click to return on the top page