Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Madaleno, and Muse
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the 2020 Census Grant Program to issue matching grants to local governments and nonprofit organizations to support the accurate counting of the population of the State and its local jurisdictions and the collection of basic demographic and housing information; establishing the 2020 Census Grant Program Panel; requiring the Grant Panel to notify local governments about the Program; expressing the intent of the General Assembly that local governments provide notice of the Program to certain nonprofit organizations; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0988
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {469238/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/11/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-50)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments {469238/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Referred Appropriations 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/23 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/26/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (90-50) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2018 3/24/2018 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18
Text - Chapter - 2020 Census Grant Program - Establishment and Funding
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM
Click to return on the top page