Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Family Impact Statements
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, Carozza, and McKay
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the fiscal note for proposed legislation prepared by the Department of Legislative Services to include a family impact statement; providing the purpose of the family impact statement is to indicate whether a bill may or will have impact on families in the state, specify the type and category of impact, including influence on marriage and family stability, marriage promotion, and family welfare; and prohibiting a committee from voting on a bill unless a family impact statement is attached to or included in the fiscal note.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Family Impact Statements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Family Impact Statements
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:01 PM
Click to return on the top page