Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Testing
Sponsored by
Chair, Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
+Authorizing, instead of requiring, the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to require an individual to pass a polygraph examination before being appointed to serve as a correctional officer in a correctional facility.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Testing
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Correctional Officers - Polygraph Testing
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:08 PM
Click to return on the top page