Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Veterans Affairs - Responses to Arrested Veterans and Veterans in Crisis
Sponsored by
Senators Folden and Gile
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Veterans Affairs to coordinate with law enforcement agencies to establish a process by which the Department and the First Responders Action Group shall receive certain information about a veteran who was arrested; requiring the Governor to include in the annual budget bill a $2,000,000 appropriation to the Maryland Police and Correctional Training Commissions; and requiring the Commissions, in consultation with the Department, to assess and develop first response practices to veterans in crisis.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024, July 1, 2025
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2024
Legislative Date
2/13/2024
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Veterans Affairs - Responses to Arrested Veterans and Veterans in Crisis
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2024 2/13/2024 Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:02 PM
Click to return on the top page