Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Encouraging the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission to approve provider applications for patients who have an opioid use disorder only if the patient has unsuccessfully tried all other traditional treatments or the patient will use the medical cannabis in conjunction with traditional therapies.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0033
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {618377/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {618377/1 Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Medical Cannabis - Provider Applications - Opioid Use Disorder
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2019 3/12/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page