Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records
Sponsored by
Senators Kelly, Lam, Hettleman, Beidle, Waldstreicher, Gile, and Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing researchers affiliated with certain institutions of higher education who are conducting academic or policy research to review a court record related to a petition for an extreme risk protective order; requiring the Maryland Judiciary to require an institution of higher education that has researchers reviewing certain court records to enter into an agreement that provides for the storage and handling of the records; and establishing certain penalties.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1267
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Folden) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {693026/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
4/01/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {933123/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/17/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-31)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2024 3/13/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Favorable 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Smith) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Folden) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Favorable 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Smith) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Floor Amendment {693026/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (33-12) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 4/01/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Favorable with Amendments {933123/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2024 3/17/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (108-31) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (32-13) 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2024 3/22/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders – Review of Court Records
Last Updated: 4/18/2024 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page