Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Sponsored by
Senator McKay
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering, clarifying, and expanding certain provisions of law relating to the immunity from liability of a parent who leaves an unharmed newborn with a responsible adult under certain circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Human Services to develop, implement, and maintain a public information program to inform the public about the Maryland Safe Haven Program; and requiring the Secretary of Human Services to annually submit a report to the General Assembly about the Maryland Safe Haven Program beginning December 31, 2025.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Courts - Immunity From Liability - Maryland Safe Haven Program
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2024 2/27/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:03 PM
Click to return on the top page