Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Eligibility and Disenrollment
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide comprehensive medical and other health care services for a pregnant Program recipient for the duration of the pregnancy and for 1 year immediately following the end of the woman's pregnancy; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop certain written materials and provide the materials to certain Program recipients at a certain time; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Eligibility and Disenrollment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Eligibility and Disenrollment
Senate 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/15/2021 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page