Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the application of certain provisions of law prohibiting an institution of higher education from paying certain financial or other incentives based on certain success to exempt the recruitment of foreign students who reside in a foreign country and are not eligible to receive federal student assistance.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
3/03/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584931/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
2/26/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/29/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-34)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/25/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2021 3/03/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Favorable with Amendments {584931/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2021 2/26/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
Senate 3/18/2021 2/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Referred Appropriations 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate J. Lewis) Adopted 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/29/2021 Third Reading Passed (100-34) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/25/2021 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Text - Chapter - Institutions of Higher Education - Prohibition Against Incentive Payments - Foreign Student Exemption
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:22 AM
Click to return on the top page