Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension and Report
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Extending the date by which Prince George's County is required to report findings on the impact of the school facilities and public safety surcharges from December 1, 2020, to December 1, 2022; extending the termination date from June 30, 2021, to June 30, 2024, for certain provisions of law that reduce the school facilities surcharge for certain multifamily housing, exempt certain dwelling units from the surcharge, and authorize Prince George's County to conduct a certain review and take certain actions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {474739/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2021 2/10/2021 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2021 3/10/2021 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Favorable with Amendments {474739/1 Adopted 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension and Report
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/09/2021 Referred Appropriations 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/09/2021 3/24/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Text - Chapter - Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges and Report - Sunset Extension and Report
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:09 PM
Click to return on the top page