Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Gallion
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing a landowner whose land is subject to an agricultural land preservation easement to use the land for the construction and use of a certain wood vault under certain circumstances; requiring a person to have a permit issued by the Secretary of the Environment before the person installs, materially alters, or materially extends a certain wood vault; applying certain provisions of law relating to permit requirements for certain facilities, including landfills, to a certain wood vault; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1250
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/09/2024
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Text - First - Environment - Wood Vaults - Authorization and Permit Requirements
Senate 2/09/2024 2/09/2024 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:04 PM
Click to return on the top page