Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias and Manno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Altering the definition of slot machine to exclude specified skills-based devices located at specified family entertainment centers; authorizing the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue an amusement gaming license to specified family entertainment centers in Worcester County; authorizing a family entertainment center that holds a license to operate specified skills-based devices that award specified prizes; requiring the Commission to determine the value of specified prizes that may be awarded; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/15/2016 2/15/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 50
House 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 69
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
(   12-301 )
(   9-1B-01, 9-1B-02 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page