Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Kramer
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing an electric school bus pilot program; requiring the Public Service Commission to implement and administer the pilot program; authorizing investor-owned electric companies to apply to the Commission to implement an electric school bus pilot program with a participating school system if the pilot program meets certain standards; and authorizing investor-owned electric companies to recover certain costs under the pilot program, subject to the approval of the Commission.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0696
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2022
Legislative Date
2/13/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2022 2/13/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page