Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from having a direct or indirect interest in more than a certain number of Class B-H (hotel), Class B-R (restaurant), and Class B-RB (restaurant/bar) on-sale beer, wine, and liquor licenses in any combination in Charles County.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1423
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Senate 2/28/2022 3/01/2022 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {133227/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Economic Matters 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 776
Text - Chapter - Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Multiple Class B Licenses
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page