Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County to be $191,078.10 beginning in 2026 and $212,309 beginning in 2027.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1060
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2024
Legislative Date
2/02/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Floor Amendment {543324/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/03/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2024 2/02/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Ready) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Floor Amendment {543324/1 (Senator Ready) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Senate 3/15/2024 3/03/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2024 3/07/2024 Referred Judiciary 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 2:05 PM
Click to return on the top page