Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regulations - Fees and Fines - Legislative Approval Required
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a regulation that increases a fee or fine that a unit is authorized to impose from taking effect until the General Assembly approves the increase through legislation that is enacted into law.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0015 Session: 2012 2nd Special Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page