Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Foreign and Domestic Corporations - Capital Investments
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing the corporate income tax rate for 3 years for specified foreign and domestic corporations that open branch offices in counties with no more than 200,000 individuals under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0014 Session: 2012 2nd Special Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-105, 10-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page