Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Duties of Secretary and Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Labor to enter into certain memorandums of understanding to implement and enforce the Maryland Unemployment Insurance Law and to conduct certain integrity activities to verify that an individual is eligible to receive certain benefits; and altering the criminal penalties for a conviction for certain unemployment insurance-related offenses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1454
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2022
Legislative Date
2/19/2022
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance Violations - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273028/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2022 2/19/2022 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance Violations - Penalties
Senate 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {273028/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Labor and Employment - Unemployment Insurance - Duties of Secretary and Penalties
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/16/2022 Referred Economic Matters 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:11 PM
Click to return on the top page